THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:22:43 PM
Lyte, Kristina Lee
CPSO#:
93667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Building P-210
641 Cambrai Road
Borden ON L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 7122
Fax: (705) 423-7242
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kristina Lyte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTINA LEE LYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2012 |