THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:32:36 PM
Hussein, Mohammad Hasaballa
CPSO#:
93663
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
28 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mohammad Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record should contact: Dr. Tarek Khalefih, Unit 112-330 Bronte Street South, Milton ON L9T7X1, Phone: 905-636-9387, Fax: 905-636-9388, Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2022 |