THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:45:31 AM
Smith, Jennifer Erin
CPSO#:
93651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ERIN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2015 |