THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:21:07 AM
Mikhail, Eric
CPSO#:
93646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 19 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |