THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:07:38 AM
Sakhia, Faria
CPSO#:
93633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Baqai Medical College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
Phone: 9052810115
Fax: 9053660067
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARIA SAKHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKHIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2016 |