THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:02:59 AM
Marchie, Alfonse
CPSO#:
93623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 267
1099 Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: 905-492-4299
Fax: 416-551-6944
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:05 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALFONSE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2017 |