THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:42:30 AM
Goguen, Denis
CPSO#:
93616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENIS GOGUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOGUEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |