THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:21:41 AM
Skeldon, Jacqueline Gail
CPSO#:
93563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Pus, Jacqueline Gail (used until: 16 Apr 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
157 Yonge St
Toronto ON
M5C 1X7
Toronto ON M5C 1X7
Phone: 416 362 8822
Fax: 416 362 8877
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GAIL SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |