THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:26:43 PM
Fantham-Tremblay, Neva Virginia
CPSO#:
93548
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fantham, Neva Virginia (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 478-7300
Fax: (705) 478-8884
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEVA VIRGINIA FANTHAM-TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTHAM-TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2015 |