THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:26:32 AM
Corrigan, Linde
CPSO#:
93544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: 613 687 6808
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Mar 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDE CORRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |