THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:38:54 AM
Shour, Rachel Shira
CPSO#:
93533
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-756-6642
Fax: 1-866-765-1487
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Futurity Medical
745 Mt. Pleasant Road
Suite 305
Toronto, ON M4S 2N4
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 May 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL SHIRA SHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Oct 2020
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2013 |