THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:46:17 AM
Connolly, Colleen Marie
CPSO#:
93521
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42760
Fax: (905) 575-2645
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLLEEN MARIE CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |