THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:30:55 AM
Chin, Esther Anne
CPSO#:
93519
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Zimbabwe
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ESTHER ANNE CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 07 Apr 2015 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2016 |