THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:38:22 PM
Suman, Shahina
CPSO#:
93476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Chittagong, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4500 Medical Center Dr
Medical City McKinney hospital
Hospitalist
1
McKinney TX 75069-1652
United States
Phone: 9725478000
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHINA SUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2014 |