THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:47:41 AM
Selvarajah, Prrasonna
CPSO#:
93457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinics
2nd Floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Phone: 905-728-7915
Fax: 905-443-0171
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
|
Active |