THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:19:31 AM
Saad, George
CPSO#:
93455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dive E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Sep 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2019 |