THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:11:44 AM
Paskar, David Drew Adamson
CPSO#:
93427
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health - Richmond Hill Ho
Room 4021C
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 3030
Fax: 289-622-1497
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID DREW ADAMSON PASKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASKAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |