THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:09:39 PM
Goldberg, Alyse Stephanie
CPSO#:
93422
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
901-2225 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 5C2
Phone: 6475601818
Fax: 6474907111
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:29 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALYSE STEPHANIE GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2015 |