THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:29:57 AM
White, Cheryl Lea-Ann
CPSO#:
93407
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Mar 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA-ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Apr 2012 to 24 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Apr 2013 to 28 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |