THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:59:27 AM
Lin, Ching-Sheng Brian
CPSO#:
93399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613)729-8262
Fax: (613)729-7870
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHING-SHENG BRIAN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |