THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:20:35 AM
Suke, Judith Hunt
CPSO#:
93397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON K0M 1S0
Phone: 705 457-5079
Fax: 705 990-2756
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2022
Corporation Name: Judith Suke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Aug 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDITH HUNT SUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |