THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:02:38 PM
Zafar, Rubeena
CPSO#:
93392
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: 905-535-7800
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUBEENA ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Aug 2011 to 30 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2013 |