THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:52:53 AM
Moodley, Preveshen
CPSO#:
93363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
202-148 Manitou Dr
Kitchener Urology Partners
Kitchener ON N2C 1L3
Phone: 519-954-2370 Ext. 105
Fax: 519-954-8560
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PREVESHEN MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Oct 2016
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2016 |