THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:59:14 AM
Sithamparanathan, Kasthuri
CPSO#:
93340
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Health center
Durham Regional HWY 2
Courtice ON L1E 3C3
Phone: 905-721-3276
Fax: 905-721-6172
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KASTHURI SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |