THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:16:23 AM
Petrera, Massimo Oronzo
CPSO#:
93334
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Bari, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301 E 17th St
NYU Langone Hospital
New York NY 10010
United States
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MASSIMO ORONZO PETRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2021 |