THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:23:54 AM
Roberts, Gwendolyn Jane
CPSO#:
93280
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
PO Box 1800
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: 905 472 7534
Fax: 905 472 7535
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GWENDOLYN JANE ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |