THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:56:08 PM
Black, Stephanie Alicia
CPSO#:
93223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
B2-441
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8355
Fax: 519-685-8573
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ALICIA BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2015 |