THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:36:10 AM
Sachar, Seerat
CPSO#:
93199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Dayanand Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 May 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
|
Active |