THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:02:34 PM
Sukkar, Ghassan Abdulrahman Abdullah
CPSO#:
93186
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |