THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 18:27:23 PM
Baharnoori, Moogeh
CPSO#:
93180
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Moogeh Baharnoori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 31 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Oct 2010
AVP - Neurology
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jan 2024 |