THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:36:33 AM
Smith, Sean Cameron
CPSO#:
93109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2936 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 1B3
Phone: (613) 232-7777
Fax: (613) 232-0777
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN CAMERON SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |