THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:02:56 PM
Manusow, Joshua Solomon
CPSO#:
93108
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Creek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto Western Hospital, 399 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 2S8
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |