THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:23:33 PM
Brown-Shreves, Danielle Nikisha
CPSO#:
93105
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
786 Bronson Ave
Restore Medical Clinics
Ottawa ON K1S 4G4
Phone: 613-416-1000
Fax: 343-888-2668
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE NIKISHA BROWN-SHREVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN-SHREVES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |