THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:33:31 PM
Goffi, Alberto
CPSO#:
93101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Turin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing 4-014
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168646060 Ext. 2474
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 May 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2021 |
|
Active |