THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:16:49 PM
Maria, Moises Simoes
CPSO#:
93086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 224-0910
Fax: (416) 800-5554
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOISES SIMOES MARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |