THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 10:35:02 AM
Lee, Jason J
CPSO#:
93076
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |