THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:57:07 PM
Maarse, Miriam Jennifer
CPSO#:
93068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Burns, Miriam Jennifer (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRIAM JENNIFER MAARSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAARSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2014 |