THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:17:19 AM
Alisic, Sarika Amelia
CPSO#:
93050
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mann, Sarika Amelia (used until: 06 Nov 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology, B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 13680
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARIKA AMELIA ALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALISIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |