THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:17:39 PM
Osmond, Allison Leanne
CPSO#:
93046
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the hospital where they were attended: Toronto General Hospital (Tel: 416-946-4501 ext. 4711) or Lakeridge Health Oshawa (Tel: 905-576-8711).
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2019 |