THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:39:40 AM
Lee, Dana Hyojin
CPSO#:
93037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
13737 96 Ave
Surrey BC V3V 0C6
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANA HYOJIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2021 |