THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:47:31 AM
Lu, Andrew Binh-Hao
CPSO#:
93011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London X-Ray Associates
104-450 Central Avenue
London ON N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270 Ext. 7051
Fax: 519-672-4459
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW BINH-HAO LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |