THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:57:04 PM
Mule, Francesco
CPSO#:
93009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 3777763
Fax: (905) 3736933
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |