THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:14:56 AM
Valdes Salinas, Mario Amilcar
CPSO#:
93006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad De El Salvador, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5262
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIO AMILCAR VALDES SALINAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALDES SALINAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |