THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:56:05 AM
Chau, Vicky
CPSO#:
93000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: (416) 586-8327
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICKY CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 06 Aug 2010
EL - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2010 to 20 Aug 2010
EL - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2012 |