THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:04:36 AM
Marion, Travis Emerson
CPSO#:
92998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Big Thunder Orthopedic Associates
984 Oliver Road, Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: 807-344-1123 Ext. 5
Fax: 807-344-1166
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRAVIS EMERSON MARION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARION is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2017 |