THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:51:32 PM
Parajian, Armen
CPSO#:
92997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Paraghamian, Armen (used until: 19 Nov 2014 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:20 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARMEN PARAJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAJIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: January 12, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Armen Parajian was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Criminal harassment, contrary to section 264(2)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: December 22, 2021
SENTENCE: Suspended sentence with 3 years’ probation;
Probation conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour;
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court;
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or probation officer of any change in employment or occupation;
4. Report to a probation officer by phone within 48 hours and for the first 12 months thereafter as directed by their probation officer;
5. Cooperate with their probation officer, including signing any releases necessary for the probation officer to monitor compliance, and provide proof of compliance with any condition of the order to the probation officer upon request;
6. Attend any assessment, treatment, counselling as recommended by the probation officer;
7. Not to contact or communicate directly or indirectly with a list of individuals whose names are subject to a publication ban;
8. Not to attend within the boundaries of named streets, as the sole occupant of vehicle.