THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:12:54 AM
Bourns, Laura Elizabeth
CPSO#:
92990
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Constellation Dr
Nepean ON K2G 6J8
Phone: (613) 580-6744 Ext. 23684
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH BOURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2016 |