THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:36:50 AM
Fuoco, Michael Benjamin
CPSO#:
92964
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-342-5668
Fax: 613-345-1568
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BENJAMIN FUOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUOCO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |