THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:32:05 AM
Lee, Jonathan Chia-Ho
CPSO#:
92935
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Address of the clinic for Hong Fook - 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue E, Toronto, ON M1S 4V5
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019
Instructions/Address:Medical Records for CAMH will be housed digitally at:
CAMH
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4.
Hong Fook Nurse Practitioner Clnic records will be housed at the clinic.
Records from LOFT will be housed digitally at Inner City Health Associates
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |