THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:20:19 AM
Satkunasingham, Janakan
CPSO#:
92915
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANAKAN SATKUNASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATKUNASINGHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |